RI S0318 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for specific fines and sanctions to operators of motor vehicles who fail to exercise due care to avoid colliding with a vulnerable road user causing injury, serious injury, or death to the vulnerable road user.
Title
Passing, Use Of Lanes, And Rules Of The Road
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. John Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-01 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/04/2021) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |