RI S0317 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state budget office to produce a citizens' guide to the state budget that is easily readable and understandable by the general public.
Title
State Budget
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2015) |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/26/2015) |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2015) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee continued |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Government Oversight |