RI S0308 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits misrepresentation of the status of an animal as a service animal in order to acquire any right or privilege afforded disabled persons.
Title
Equal Rights Of Blind And Deaf Persons To Public Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |