RI S0303 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the town council of New Shoreham to adopt a tax classification plan in accordance with the provisions of this section, to be applicable to taxes on or after the assessment date of December 31, 2023.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-16 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/16/2023) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2023) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2023) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/09/2023) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |