RI S0298 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Registration Of Vehicles (would Authorize The Division Of Motor Vehicles To Issue Special License Plates In Recognition Of "choose Life.")
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Registration Of Vehicles (would Authorize The Division Of Motor Vehicles To Issue Special License Plates In Recognition Of "choose Life.")
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/01/2013) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |