RI S0290 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires employers with eighteen (18) or more employees to provide three (3) paid sick days in 2018, four (4) paid sick days in 2019 and five (5) paid sick days thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthy And Safe Families And Workplaces Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Healthy and safe families and workplaces act approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Healthy and safe families and workplaces act lc001160/3 (Y: 3 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Healthy and safe families and workplaces act lc1160/4 (Y: 6 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseSigned by Governor
2017-09-25HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-09-19SenateSenate passed Sub B in concurrence
2017-09-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-09-19HouseHouse passed Sub B
2017-09-15HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-09-15HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2017-09-15HouseScheduled for consideration (09/15/2017)
2017-06-30HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub B as amended
2017-06-30HouseScheduled for consideration (06/30/2017)
2017-06-30HouseReferred to House Labor
2017-06-28SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2017-06-21SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017)
2017-06-21SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-16SenateScheduled for consideration (06/21/2017)
2017-04-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-04-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017)
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://status.rilin.state.ri.us/
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText17/SenateText17/S0290.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText17/SenateText17/S0290A.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText17/SenateText17/S0290Aaa.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText17/SenateText17/S0290Baa.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText17/SenateText17/S0290B.pdf
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=11013
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=11012
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=11011
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=11010
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=11229
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=15241

Bill Comments

feedback