RI S0289 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Probate Practice And Procedure - Unclaimed Intangible And Tangible Property (would Provide That Police Departments And Local Drug Control Divisions Would Be Allowed To Keep Confiscated Property, And Any Income Derived From Such Property Would Be Used For Community Or Law Enforcement Purposes.)
Title
An Act Relating To Probate Practice And Procedure - Unclaimed Intangible And Tangible Property (would Provide That Police Departments And Local Drug Control Divisions Would Be Allowed To Keep Confiscated Property, And Any Income Derived From Such Property Would Be Used For Community Or Law Enforcement Purposes.)
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. James Doyle [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0289.pdf |