RI S0273 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals ยง 25-3-7 of the general laws which gives the director of the department of labor and training the authority to exempt certain classes of employees from receiving overtime pay for Sunday and holiday work.
Title
Work On Holidays And Sundays
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] |
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2021) |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2021) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |