RI S0272 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the earned income tax credit from fifteen percent (15%) to twenty percent (20%) for the tax years 2020 and beyond.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |