RI S0270 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes aging/disability resource center within division of elderly affairs as part of long-term care system for elderly/disabled persons/family caregivers/providers and makes annual appropriation in the sum of $1,000,000 to establish the center.
Title
The Rhode Island Aging And Disability Resource Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2017) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |