RI S0269 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Rhode Island’s membership in the interstate medical licensure compact. It details the procedure to be followed in order to allow physicians to become licensed in multiple states, while ensuring the safety of patients.
Title
The Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0269.pdf |