RI S0261 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended indefinite postponement
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended indefinite postponement
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires every electric distribution company and natural gas distribution company to submit to the division of public utilities and carriers an emergency response plan for review and approval.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0261.pdf |