RI S0256 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the maximum fine amount for those found guilty of unprofessional conduct by the board of medical licensure and discipline from $10,000 to $30,000 and would establish a new chapter of the general laws.
Title
Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |