RI S0254 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the ODEO to create and for all state and municipal employees to receive annual training in cultural competency.
Title
Department Of Administration
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Department of administration approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |