RI S0250 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces age from 25 to 18.
Title
Adoption Of Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |