RI S0246 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ISAAC'S LAW) (Prohibits discrimination against a potential organ transplant recipient based solely on a physical or mental disability.
Title
Nondiscrimination In Access To Anatomical Gifts And Organ Transplant Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |