RI S0243 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Meeting postponed (04/10/2019)
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Meeting postponed (04/10/2019)
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the owner of motor vehicles, which is between ten (10) and twenty (20) years old and cannot locate a title certificate obtain a registration certificate with the name of the current registered owner(s).
Title
Missing Titles For Older Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0243.pdf |