RI S0222 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a financial incentive for business entities to create new jobs by offering a business tax reduction.
Title
Rhode Island New Qualified Jobs Incentive Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2015) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |