RI S0220 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a refundable ten cent ($0.10) deposit for non-reusable beverage containers. A four cents ($0.04) handling fee would be paid by distributors.
Title
Beverage Container Deposit Recycling Act Of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0220.pdf |