RI S0220 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes amendments and additions to the Central Coventry Fire District charter and would take effect no later than sixty (60) days after its enactment and all acts or parts of acts inconsistent herewith or repugnant thereto, are hereby repealed.
Title
In Amendment To The Charter Of The Central Coventry Fire District Pursuant To A Resolution Of The Board Of Directors Of The Coventry Fire District Adopted On September 9, 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0220.pdf |