RI S0214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEE TITLE 19 CHAPTER 97 - THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Provides for a minimum standard for the public education system.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0214.pdf |