RI S0199 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Children (would Require That Signs Provided By The Dept Of Behavioral Healthcare/developmental Disabilities/hospitals Providing Warnings About Health Effects Of Tobacco And Information On Smoking Cessation Resources Be Prominently Displayed In English And Spanish)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Children (would Require That Signs Provided By The Dept Of Behavioral Healthcare/developmental Disabilities/hospitals Providing Warnings About Health Effects Of Tobacco And Information On Smoking Cessation Resources Be Prominently Displayed In English And Spanish)
Sponsors
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2013) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2013) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2013) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0199.pdf |