RI S0198 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows business vehicles which are owned by an entity which a veteran owns, and is registered and authorized to conduct business in the state of Rhode Island, to register such business vehicles with veteran plates.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2021) |
2021-06-11 | House | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2021) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2021) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |