RI S0193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Refunds the minimum tax paid by corporations with annual gross income of less than four hundred dollars ($400); but caps the amount refunded at four hundred dollars ($400).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Corporation Tax And Franchise Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-03SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019)
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback