RI S0193 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevents funds from the worker's compensation administrative fund restricted receipts account from being transferred to the general fund.
Title
Relating Labor And Labor Relations -- Workers' Compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0193.pdf |