RI S0189 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "The Rhode Island Utility Fair Share Roadway Repair Act" which requires public utilities to properly repair and repave roadways affected by the actions of the utility.
Title
The Rhode Island Utility Fair Share Roadway Repair Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Fair share roadway repair act approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Fair share roadway repair act approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |