RI S0175 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the town of Middletown to sell an abandoned highway or driftway to the abutting property owner making the abandonment request at fair market value.
Title
Abandonment By Towns
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-25 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |