RI S0171 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes within the executive office of health and human services a program, informed by an advisory council, to assure equitable financing and facilitate access to medication for rare diseases.
Title
The Rhode Island Rare Disease Medication Accessibility, Affordability, And Reinsurance Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2021) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0171.pdf |