RI S0168 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the maximum dollar amount from two thousand five hundred dollars ($2,500) to five thousand dollars ($5,000) for claims handled in small claims court.
Title
Procedure In Particular Actions - Small Claims And Consumer Claims
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0168.pdf |