RI S0152 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Defeated in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Codifies the current state of the law on reproductive rights in Rhode Island by incorporating the protections set forth in Roe v. Wade limiting restrictions on an individual's decision to terminate a pregnancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Reproductive Health Care Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateDefeated in Committee
2019-05-10SenateScheduled for consideration (05/14/2019)
2019-03-05SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2019-03-05SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2019-03-04SenateProposed Substitute
2019-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019)
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback