RI S0146 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adds two (2) requirements that a hospital provide to a prospective patient, the requested cost estimate of their requested anticipated hospital services within five (5) business days of request and the cost of any facility fee.
Title
Licensing Of Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Licensing of care facilities approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Health care facilities (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Licensing of care facilities approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Health care facilities (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |