RI S0145 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-02 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-02 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of parental or family leave available to an employee from thirteen (13) weeks to twenty-four (24) weeks in any two (2) calendar years.
Title
Rhode Island Parental And Family Medical Leave Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |