RI S0143 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for physician/patient discussion regarding addiction and alternate treatment prior to initial and third opioid prescription.
Title
Uniform Control Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] |
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |