RI S0135 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Purchase And Use Of Textbooks In Public Schools: would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the Special Legislative Commission to study the purchase and use of textbooks in public schools from March 5, 2011, to October 1, 2011, and said commission would expire on December 31, 2011
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Purchase And Use Of Textbooks In Public Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
Sen. Glenford Shibley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-28 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-22 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-22 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-06-22 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-13 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2011-02-03 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-01-27 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0135.pdf |