RI S0132 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the deinstitutionalization subsidy aid program in the department of behavioral healthcare, developmental disabilities and hospitals to include adoptive parent(s) or siblings(s).
Title
Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0132.pdf |