RI S0127 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes 1% state tax on sale of hookah tobacco/vaping devices, accessories/supplies/replacement parts & 1% local hookah tobacco/vaping devices tax to be used by cities/towns for education of persons of the dangers of hookah tobacco/vaping device usage.
Title
Sale And Use Taxes -- Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0127.pdf |