RI S0120 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that quasi-public corporations limit the use of all funds and property to perform the function or service for which the quasi-public corporation was created.
Title
Quasi-public Corporations Accountability And Transparency Act
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0120.pdf |