RI S0117 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure - Courts - District Court: would reduce the number of divisions of the district court from six (6) to four (4
Title
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure - Courts - District Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-14 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | House passed Sub A | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2011-04-28 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-29 | Committee continued | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0117.pdf |