RI S0116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds disabled veterans with honorable discharge who purchase a new motor vehicle to the category of certain veterans exempt from sales and use taxes.
Title
Sales And Use Tax - Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0116.pdf |