RI S0112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the renewable energy growth program for an additional ten (10) years after the fifth program year, with an annual target of forty (40) nameplate megawatts for each year of the ten (10) year period.
Title
Renewable Energy Growth Program
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] |
Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-01 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2017) |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2017) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/03/2017) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |