RI S0108 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits clinical laboratories to conduct its own analysis of specimens for the detection of HIV/AIDS instead of sending the specimens to the department of health.
Title
Prevention And Suppression Of Contagious Diseases -- Hiv/aids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-22 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2021) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/23/2021) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |