RI S0090 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the "Healthy Workplace Act of 2019" and would establish a cause of action against employers and employees for workplace bullying, harassment and other abusive conduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthy Workplace

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseReferred to House Labor
2019-04-10SenateSenate read and passed
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/10/2019)
2019-04-03SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-03-29SenateScheduled for consideration (04/03/2019)
2019-02-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019)
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback