RI S0086 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a special motor vehicle registration plates for the Salt Water Anglers Association.
Title
Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles-special License Plates
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
Sen. Mark Gee [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |