RI S0084 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the duty of the commission and the division of public utilities to ensure affordability and sustainability for basic care necessities.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0084.pdf |