RI S0084 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacturing, importation, sale, shipment, delivery, possession, or transfer of any firearm that is undetectable by metal detectors commonly used at airports and public buildings including 3D printed firearms as defined herein.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Weapons approval of amendment (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |