RI S0083 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires dry cleaners to post a list containing retail prices charged for each type of garment, except garments requiring special handling or to display a printed flyer with prices in a conspicuous place.
Title
Laundries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/29/2015) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/16/2015) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2015) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |