RI S0077 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island hope scholarship pilot program to provide two-year scholarships to junior and seniors at Rhode Island college.
Title
Rhode Island Hope Scholarship Pilot Program Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-16 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-16 | Senate | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-16 | House | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2023-06-16 | House | Senate voted to reconsider |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2023) |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |