RI S0077 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expands drug awareness programs to high schools, directs funding from certain civil fines and mandates establishment of criteria for funding.
Title
The Uniformed Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |