RI S0076 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that commencing with the graduating class of 2022 and all subsequent graduating classes thereafter, all high school students attending public schools shall fulfill at least one-half credit or course requirement in civics education.
Title
The Civic Literacy Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-26 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to House Education |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/09/2021) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |