RI S0073 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Uniform Act on the Prevention and Remedies for Human Trafficking" which would establish penalties and remedies for human trafficking.
Title
Relating Criminal Offenses - Uniform Act On The Prevention Of And Remedies For Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - & remedies for human trafficking approval of amendment (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - & remedies for human trafficking approval of amendment (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |